Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Éric Marie de Moulins d’Amieu de Beaufort

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1962 Born
8 Sep 199028.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 199129.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
21 May 200846.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
21 May 200846.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cresima
5 Sep 200846.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cresima
18 Aug 201856.5AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
28 Oct 201856.7InstalledArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Éric Marie de Moulins d’Amieu de Beaufort (VIAF: 85239615)
Archbishop Éric Marie de Moulins d’Amieu de Beaufort (born ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLandau in der Pfalz, Diocese of Speyer, Germany
Ordained DeaconSaint-Etienne du Mont, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Reims.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,955
  • od/c0: AJ, 25 May 2018
  • c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Aug 2018
  • i: CB, 18 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast