Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Gervaise

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Horrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1662¹BornParis
3 Jun 172664.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea
11 Jun 172664.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea
20 Nov 172967.8DiedTitular Bishop of Horrea

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Gervaise:
Bishop Nicolas Gervaise (born 1662, died ) Titular Bishop of Horrea

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 223
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1726, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015