Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Darboy

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1813Born
17 Dec 183623.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Aug 185946.6SelectedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
26 Sep 185946.6ConfirmedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
30 Nov 185946.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
17 Jan 186350.0SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
16 Mar 186350.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
24 May 187158.3DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Georges Darboy (VIAF: 39424942)
Archbishop Georges Darboy (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFayl-Billot, Diocese of Langres
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 401, and Page 441
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017