Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre-Marie Paul Cardinal Gerlier

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1880Born
18 Dec 192040.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jul 192141.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
14 May 192949.3AppointedBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
2 Jul 192949.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
8 Jul 192949.4InstalledBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
30 Jul 193757.5AppointedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
13 Dec 193757.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 193757.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
17 Jan 196585.0DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Paul Gerlier (VIAF: 39425553)
Pierre-Marie Paul Cardinal Gerlier (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVersailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
  • a cardinal for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,929, Number 52
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 308, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 418, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 598, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,038, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast