Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice-Charles-Alfred de Cormont

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax, France

Titular Archbishop of Brysis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1847Born
10 Jun 187629.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 189952.6SelectedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
14 Dec 189952.7ConfirmedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
1 May 190053.0Ordained BishopBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
27 Nov 191164.6AppointedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
21 Feb 191264.8InstalledBishop of Aire et Dax, France
22 Dec 193083.7RetiredBishop of Aire et Dax, France
22 Dec 193083.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Brysis
25 Apr 193386.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Maurice-Charles-Alfred de Cormont
Archbishop Maurice-Charles-Alfred de Cormont (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast