Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Vivant

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

Titular Bishop of Paros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1660Born
28 Nov 172969.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
28 Nov 172969.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
8 Oct 173070.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paros
16 Feb 173979.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Vivant
Bishop Jean Vivant (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 307
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,730, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast