Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre-Armand Cardinal du Camboust de Coislin

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1636Born
24 May 166528.5SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
16 Aug 166528.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 166629.3ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
20 Jun 166629.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
22 Jul 169760.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Mar 170063.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
5 Feb 170669.2DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Armand du Camboust de Coislin
Pierre-Armand Cardinal du Camboust de Coislin (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jul 1697
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 102
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,666, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast