Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Antoine Phélypeaux

Deceased

Bishop of Lodève


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654BornParis
1 Nov 169036.8SelectedBishop of Lodève, France
7 Jul 169238.5ConfirmedBishop of Lodève, France
24 Aug 169238.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
15 Apr 173278.3DiedBishop of Lodève, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Antoine Phélypeaux:
Bishop Jacques-Antoine Phélypeaux (died ) Bishop of Lodève

  • a bishop for 39.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013