Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Louis-Philippe de Lézay de Lusignan

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornParis
31 May 168454.4SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
12 Oct 169363.7ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
15 Nov 169363.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
25 Feb 171686.1DiedBishop of Rodez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul-Louis-Philippe de Lézay de Lusignan:
Bishop Paul-Louis-Philippe de Lézay de Lusignan (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Rodez

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 338
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015