Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Narcisse Baptifolier

Deceased

Bishop of Mende, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1819Born
6 Jun 184626.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 188969.3SelectedBishop of Mende, France
27 May 188969.4ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
11 Aug 188969.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
26 Sep 190080.7DiedBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for François-Narcisse Baptifolier
Bishop François-Narcisse Baptifolier (born , died ) Bishop of Mende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSt. Bernard de la Chapelle, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast