Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Poncet de la Rivière

Deceased

Bishop of Uzés


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638BornParis
30 Dec 167538.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 167739.5SelectedBishop of Uzés, France
14 Mar 167840.2ConfirmedBishop of Uzés, France
8 May 167840.4Ordained BishopBishop of Uzés, France
18 Nov 172890.9DiedBishop of Uzés, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Poncet de la Rivière:
Bishop Michel Poncet de la Rivière (died ) Bishop of Uzés

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 50.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013