Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de Morenne

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550²Born
23 Oct 160050.8AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
29 Jul 160151.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
2 Mar 160656.1DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Morenne
Bishop Claude de Morenne (born 1550, died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 299
  • b/c2+: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 54
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018