Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Callens, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Prelate of Tunis

Titular Archbishop of Moxori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1918BornParis, France
29 May 194325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
9 Jan 196546.9AppointedPrelate of Tunis, Tunisia
9 Jan 196546.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Moxori
11 Apr 196547.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Moxori
19 Aug 199072.5DiedPrelate of Tunis, Tunisia

MicroData Summary for Michel Callens:
Archbishop Michel Callens M. Afr. (born , died ) Prelate of Tunis

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013