Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal du Bellay

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Administrator of Bordeaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1492BornCastle of Glatigny, Souday
12 Feb 152432.1AppointedBishop of Bayonne, France
16 Sep 153240.7AppointedBishop of Paris, France
21 May 153543.4Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 153543.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
22 Aug 154149.6AppointedAdministrator of Limoges, France
1 Nov 154250.8AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
13 Aug 154452.6ResignedAdministrator of Limoges, France
17 Dec 154453.0AppointedAdministrator of Bordeaux, France
26 Oct 154755.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
9 Apr 154856.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro
25 Feb 154957.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
28 Feb 155058.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
16 Mar 155159.2ResignedBishop of Paris, France
3 Jul 155159.5ResignedAdministrator of Bordeaux, France
29 Nov 155159.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
11 Dec 155361.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
29 May 155563.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
27 Jul 155664.6ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
15 Feb 155967.1AppointedAdministrator of Bordeaux, France
16 Feb 156068.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Jean du Bellay:
Cardinal Jean du Bellay (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a cardinal for 24.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 May 1535
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 162

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013