Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François des Monstiers de Mérinville

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1682BornParis
26 Apr 170927.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Chartres, France
26 Sep 170927.6SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
10 Mar 171028.1ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
18 May 171028.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
10 May 174664.2DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François des Monstiers de Mérinville:
Bishop Charles-François des Monstiers de Mérinville (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015