Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Armand de Lorraine d’Armagnac

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1665Born
15 Jun 171853.3SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
18 Sep 171954.5ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
5 Nov 171954.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
9 Jun 172863.3DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

MicroData Summary for François-Armand de Lorraine d’Armagnac
Bishop François-Armand de Lorraine d’Armagnac (born , died ) Bishop of Bayeux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast