Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert-Marie Joseph Cyrille de Monléon, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1937Born
2 Feb 196427.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Jul 196427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Aug 198851.5AppointedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
1 Oct 198851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
17 Aug 199962.5AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
9 Aug 201275.5RetiredBishop of Meaux, France
29 Apr 201982.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Albert-Marie Joseph Cyrille de Monléon (VIAF: 64009541)
Bishop Albert-Marie Joseph Cyrille de Monléon O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSeminary St-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestLe Saulchoir, Convent, Étiolles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained BishopSaint-Antonin, Cathedral, Pamiers, Diocese of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,816
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Aug 2012
  • c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • d: CB, 30 Apr 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast