Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Étienne-René Cardinal Potier de Gesvres

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1697BornParis
172527.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 172831.1SelectedBishop of Beauvais, France
24 Apr 172831.3ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais, France
6 Jun 172831.4Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
5 Apr 175659.2Elevated to Cardinal
2 Aug 175861.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
22 May 177275.3RetiredBishop of Beauvais, France
24 Jul 177477.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for Étienne-René Potier de Gesvres:
Étienne-René Cardinal Potier de Gesvres (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 46.1 years
  • a cardinal for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1756

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015