Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrice Flynn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nevers

Titular Bishop of Arneae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1874BornLevallois Perret
10 Jul 189823.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 193258.0AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
18 Oct 193258.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
17 Dec 196389.3RetiredBishop of Nevers, France
17 Dec 196389.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arneae
13 Oct 197096.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Patrice Flynn:
Bishop Patrice Flynn (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nevers

  • a priest for 72.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013