Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas de Thou

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1528¹Born
8 Apr 157345.2AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
29 Jun 157345.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
5 Nov 159870.8DiedBishop of Chartres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Thou (VIAF: 207173396)
Bishop Nicolas de Thou (born 1528, died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceVilleben sur Yvette

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 153
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast