Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Martineau de Turé

Deceased

Bishop of Bazas, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Apr 1646AppointedBishop of Bazas, France
17 Jun 1646Ordained BishopBishop of Bazas, France
24 May 1667DiedBishop of Bazas, France

MicroData Summary for Samuel Martineau de Turé
Bishop Samuel Martineau de Turé (died ) Bishop of Bazas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 20.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 360
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast