Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Henri Guibert, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1915Born
6 Jul 194125.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Aug 194125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
15 Dec 194934.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dakar, Senegal
15 Dec 194934.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dices
19 Feb 195034.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dices
7 Nov 196045.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
19 Feb 197559.4ResignedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
30 Sep 199782.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

MicroData Summary for Georges-Henri Guibert (VIAF: 291437936)
Bishop Georges-Henri Guibert C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Dakar, Vicariate Apostolic of Dakar, Senegal
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 6
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast