Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François-Nicholas-Madeleine Cardinal Morlot

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1795BornLangres
27 May 182024.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 183943.2SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
8 Jul 183943.5ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
18 Aug 183943.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
2 Jul 184246.5SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
27 Jan 184347.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
7 Mar 185357.2Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jun 185357.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
26 Jan 185761.1SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
19 Mar 185761.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
25 Apr 185761.3InstalledArchbishop of Paris, France
29 Dec 186267.0DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for François-Nicholas-Madeleine Morlot:
Cardinal François-Nicholas-Madeleine Morlot (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
  • a cardinal for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 441, and Page 51
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 96, and Page 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013