Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Henri Edouard Frikart, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Titular Bishop of Summula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1922BornErmont
2 Jul 194826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
21 Jun 198664.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
21 Jun 198664.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Summula
2 Sep 198664.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Summula
2 Sep 199775.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
18 Dec 201492.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Claude Henri Edouard Frikart:
Bishop Claude Henri Edouard Frikart C.I.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015