Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Potier

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1617AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
17 Sep 1617Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
19 Jun 1650DiedBishop of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for Augustin Potier:
Bishop Augustin Potier (died ) Bishop of Beauvais

  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 63, Number 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015