Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Verthamon

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornParis
8 Sep 169347.6SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
9 Nov 169347.8ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
3 Jan 169448.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
20 Mar 173589.2DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste de Verthamon:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Verthamon (born 1646, died ) Bishop of Pamiers

  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015