Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Chartier

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1386¹Born
6 Dec 144761.9AppointedBishop of Paris, France
13 Jun 144862.4ConfirmedBishop of Paris, France
22 Jul 144862.5Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
1 May 147286.3DiedBishop of Paris, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Chartier (VIAF: 260981676)
Bishop Guillaume Chartier (born 1386, died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBayeux
Ordained BishopSaint-Victor, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast