Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques-Bonne Gigault de Bellefonds

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1698Born
1723¹24.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Oct 173537.4SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
27 Feb 173637.8ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
25 Mar 173637.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
20 Aug 174143.3SelectedArchbishop of Arles, France
25 Nov 174143.5ResignedBishop of Bayonne, France
20 Dec 174143.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Arles, France
14 Mar 174647.8SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
2 May 174648.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
20 Jul 174648.2DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Bonne Gigault de Bellefonds
Archbishop Jacques-Bonne Gigault de Bellefonds (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau de Montifray, Beaumont-la-Roche

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 97, and Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast