Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hervé Jean Luc Renaudin

Deceased

Bishop of Pontoise, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1941Born
26 Jun 197129.9Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
30 Nov 200059.3AppointedBishop of Pontoise, France
7 Jan 200159.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pontoise, France
18 Jan 200361.4DiedBishop of Pontoise, France

MicroData Summary for Hervé Jean Luc Renaudin
Bishop Hervé Jean Luc Renaudin (born , died ) Bishop of Pontoise

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopHall Saint-Martin, Pontoise, Diocese of Pontoise
Death PlacePontoise, Diocese of Pontoise
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Maclou, Cathedral, Pontoise, Diocese of Pontoise

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,879
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1opd/loc: AJ, 2 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast