Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Henry Pierre Marie Hérouard

Auxiliary Bishop of Lille, France

Titular Bishop of Maillezais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1956 Born
30 Sep 198428.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 198528.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
22 Feb 201760.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France
22 Feb 201760.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Maillezais
30 Apr 201760.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maillezais

MicroData Summary for Antoine Henry Pierre Marie Hérouard (VIAF: 212932933)
Bishop Antoine Henry Pierre Marie Hérouard (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuilly-sur-Seine, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconNotre Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre Dame de la Treille, Cathedral, Lille, Archdiocese of Lille

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lille.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Feb 2017
  • c34: CB, 7 Mar 2017
  • c1: AJ, 8 Mar 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,416
  • od/c0: AJ, 25 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 May 2018

Quantcast