Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Véniat, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sarh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1917BornParis, France
31 Jul 194931.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Dec 196144.2AppointedBishop of Fort-Archambault, Chad
1 Apr 196244.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fort-Archambault, Chad
7 Mar 198769.5ResignedBishop of Sarh, Chad
3 Mar 199880.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Sarh, Chad

MicroData Summary for Henri Véniat:
Bishop Henri Véniat S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sarh

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 27
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1995, Page 633

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 20 Nov 2013