Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anne-François-Victor Le Tonnelier de Breteuil

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1724Born
10 Oct 176238.7SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
24 Jan 176339.0ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
24 Feb 176339.0Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
14 Aug 179470.5DiedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Anne-François-Victor Le Tonnelier de Breteuil
Bishop Anne-François-Victor Le Tonnelier de Breteuil (born , died ) Bishop of Montauban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast