Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henri-Marie-Gaston Boisnormand Cardinal de Bonnechose

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1800BornParis
21 Dec 183333.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 184747.5SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
17 Jan 184847.6ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
30 Jan 184847.7Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
2 Dec 185454.5SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
23 Mar 185554.8ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
20 Feb 185857.7SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
18 Mar 185857.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
11 Dec 186363.5Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 186464.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
28 Oct 188383.4DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie-Gaston Boisnormand de Bonnechose:
Cardinal Henri-Marie-Gaston Boisnormand de Bonnechose (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
  • a cardinal for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 181, and Page 255
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 486, and Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Dec 1863

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013