Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aymeric de Magnac (Maignac)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pseudocardinal of S. Eusebio)


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1368AppointedBishop of Paris, France
23 Dec 1383ResignedBishop of Paris, France
21 Mar 1385DiedBishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Aymeric de Magnac (Maignac):
Bishop Aymeric de Magnac (Maignac) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 391
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013