Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Le Bègue de Germiny

Bishop Emeritus of Blois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1939 BornSaint-Maurice-du-Désert
29 Jun 197434.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 199757.3AppointedBishop of Blois, France
24 May 199757.5Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
22 Nov 201474.9RetiredBishop of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Maurice Le Bègue de Germiny:
Bishop Maurice Le Bègue de Germiny (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Blois

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Blois.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015