Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-François Sibour

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

Titular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1807BornIstres
Dec 183225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
27 Dec 185447.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
27 Dec 185447.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
14 Jan 185547.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
3 Jan 185749.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
18 Nov 186457.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Léon-François Sibour:
Bishop Léon-François Sibour (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 567

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013