Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Sanguin de Livry

Deceased

Bishop of Senlis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹BornParis
23 Jun 165130.4SelectedBishop of Senlis, France
28 Oct 165130.8ConfirmedBishop of Senlis, France
14 Jan 165231.0Ordained BishopBishop of Senlis, France
13 Mar 170281.1DiedBishop of Senlis, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis Sanguin de Livry:
Bishop Denis Sanguin de Livry (died ) Bishop of Senlis

  • a bishop for 50.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015