Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alexandre-Angélique Cardinal Talleyrand de Périgord

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1736BornParis
176124.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 176629.8SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Reims, France
1 Dec 176630.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Reims, France
1 Dec 176630.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
27 Dec 176630.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
27 Oct 177741.0SucceededArchbishop of Reims, France
8 Nov 181680.1RetiredArchbishop of Reims, France
28 Jul 181780.8Elevated to Cardinal
9 Sep 181780.9SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
1 Oct 181781.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
20 Oct 182185.0DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Angélique Talleyrand de Périgord:
Cardinal Alexandre-Angélique Talleyrand de Périgord (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 54.8 years
  • a cardinal for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013