Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Marie-Joseph François de Provenchères

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Créteil, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1907Born
16 Mar 193528.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
24 Jun 193528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
9 Oct 196659.5AppointedBishop of Créteil, France
20 Nov 196659.6Ordained BishopBishop of Créteil, France
13 Aug 198174.4RetiredBishop of Créteil, France
17 Mar 199285.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Créteil, France

MicroData Summary for Robert Marie-Joseph François de Provenchères (VIAF: 9972818)
Bishop Robert Marie-Joseph François de Provenchères (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Créteil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoulins, Diocese of Moulins
Ordained Deaconla Médaille Miraculeuse, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceThiais, Diocese of Créteil
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame, Cathedral, Créteil, Diocese of Créteil

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast