Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Léon-Adolphe Cardinal Amette

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1850Born
20 Dec 187323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
8 Jul 189847.8SelectedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
28 Nov 189848.2ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
25 Jan 189948.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
21 Feb 190655.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Paris, France
21 Feb 190655.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
28 Jan 190857.3SucceededArchbishop of Paris, France
27 Nov 191161.2Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 191161.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
29 Aug 192069.9DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Léon-Adolphe Amette (VIAF: 49306343)
Léon-Adolphe Cardinal Amette (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDouville, Diocese of Evreux
Ordained PriestParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopCathedral, Evreux, Diocese of Evreux
Death PlaceAntony, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Notre-Dame, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 138
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017