Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Maurice-Marie Rivière

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Monaco

Titular Archbishop of Anchialus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1871Born
22 Dec 189423.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
7 Jul 189523.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
2 Mar 193664.3AppointedBishop of Monaco
31 Mar 193664.3Ordained BishopBishop of Monaco
13 May 195381.5RetiredBishop of Monaco
13 May 195381.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anchialus
7 Nov 196190.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Monaco

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Maurice-Marie Rivière (VIAF: 95322104)
Archbishop Pierre-Maurice-Marie Rivière (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Monaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSaint-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 21
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast