Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie-Armand de Simiane de Gordes

Deceased

Bishop of Langres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627¹Born
28 Apr 166942.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 167144.7AppointedBishop of Langres, France
30 Nov 167144.9Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
21 Nov 169568.8DiedBishop of Langres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie-Armand de Simiane de Gordes
Bishop Louis-Marie-Armand de Simiane de Gordes (born 1627, died ) Bishop of Langres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 26.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast