Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Emmanuel Célestin Cardinal Suhard

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1874BornBrain-sur-les-Marches
18 Dec 189723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Laval, France
6 Jul 192854.2AppointedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
3 Oct 192854.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
23 Dec 193056.7AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
16 Dec 193561.6Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 193561.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
11 May 194066.0AppointedArchbishop of Paris, France
30 May 194975.1DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Célestin Suhard:
Emmanuel Célestin Cardinal Suhard (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
  • a cardinal for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015