Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Chamillart

Deceased

Bishop of Senlis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657¹BornParis
5 Apr 169235.2SelectedBishop of Dol, France
6 Oct 169235.7ConfirmedBishop of Dol, France
30 Nov 169235.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dol, France
5 Apr 170245.2SelectedBishop of Senlis, France
31 Jul 170245.5ConfirmedBishop of Senlis, France
16 Apr 171457.2DiedBishop of Senlis, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Chamillart:
Bishop Jean-François Chamillart (born 1657, died ) Bishop of Senlis

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 186, and Page 357
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015