Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel-Jules-Marie Marbeau

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1844BornParis
3 Jun 187126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
8 Feb 191065.2AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
3 May 191065.4Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
31 May 192176.5DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-Jules-Marie Marbeau:
Bishop Emmanuel-Jules-Marie Marbeau (born , died ) Bishop of Meaux

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015