Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucien-Sidroine Lebrun

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1896Born
29 Jun 192327.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jul 194044.4AppointedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
3 Oct 194044.5Ordained BishopBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
22 Mar 196670.0ResignedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
22 Mar 196670.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania
10 Dec 197074.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania
5 May 198589.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France

MicroData Summary for Lucien-Sidroine Lebrun
Bishop Lucien-Sidroine Lebrun (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017