Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas de Malezieu

Deceased

Bishop of Lavaur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1674¹BornParis
22 Apr 171339.3SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
18 Sep 171339.7ConfirmedBishop of Lavaur, France
22 Oct 171339.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
14 Mar 174874.2DiedBishop of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Malezieu:
Bishop Nicolas de Malezieu (born 1674, died ) Bishop of Lavaur

  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015