Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominique de Vic

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹BornParis
27 Jan 162537.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Auch, France
27 Jan 162537.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
25 May 162537.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
29 Oct 162941.8SucceededArchbishop of Auch, France
21 Dec 166072.9DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominique de Vic:
Archbishop Dominique de Vic (died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 105, and Page 164
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015