Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-François-Gabriel de Hénin-Liétard

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666¹BornParis
28 Apr 171347.3AppointedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
9 Jul 171347.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alès (Alais), France
1 Nov 171953.8SelectedArchbishop of Embrun, France
27 May 172054.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Embrun, France
26 Apr 172458.3DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-François-Gabriel de Hénin-Liétard:
Archbishop Louis-François-Gabriel de Hénin-Liétard (born 1666, died ) Archbishop of Embrun

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 76, and Page 191
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015