Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emile Marcus, P.S.S.

Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1930 Born
29 Jun 195727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
16 Feb 197746.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
16 Feb 197746.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
13 May 197746.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
15 Apr 198251.7AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
7 May 199665.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
3 Dec 199666.4SucceededArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
11 Jul 200676.0RetiredArchbishop of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France

MicroData Summary for Emile Marcus
Archbishop Emile Marcus P.S.S. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuilly-Plaisance

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017